Financial history BRITISH OVERSEAS NGOS FOR DEVELOPMENT (BOND)

Charity number: 1068839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.89m £4.17m £3.88m £3.76m £2.73m
Total expenditure £3.50m £3.73m £3.48m £3.46m £3.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.15m £1.69m £892.76k £657.54k £657.54k
Income - Donations and legacies £892.88k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.00m £4.17m £3.88m £3.75m £2.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.85k £1.59k £682 £6.15k £23.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.47m £3.69m £3.43m £3.39m £3.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £29.54k £41.19k £52.76k £62.86k £184.25k
Expenditure - Governance £26.40k £27.28k £31.16k £59.82k £68.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £168.17k £457.54k £275.30k £106.82k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0