Trustees BRITISH OVERSEAS NGOS FOR DEVELOPMENT (BOND)
Charity number: 1068839

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty Smith | Chair | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Newman | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shazia Arshad | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abu Akeem | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Gordon | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Jasmina Haynes | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Othman Moqbel | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Beacon | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lauren Codman | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anushree Chirag Rao | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stella Opoku-Owusu | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rainatou Sow | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Waring | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.