Financial history ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY - ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS BRANCH

Charity number: 1065173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.73k £265 £2.77k £3.83k £4.86k
Total expenditure £3.78k £110 £2.77k £3.60k £4.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A