Financial history TIFERES HIGH SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 1066260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £712.80k £740.75k £831.33k £869.01k £924.29k
Total expenditure £696.33k £787.76k £890.63k £952.09k £898.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £159.36k £102.68k £82.48k £90.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £313.84k £195.72k £185.36k £237.07k £437.78k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £397.94k £384.63k £598.65k £631.94k £486.51k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.02k £1.05k £1.08k £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £159.36k £46.24k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £696.33k £787.76k £890.63k £952.09k £898.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £3.84k £3.84k £3.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0