Financial history RE-VISION LTD

Charity number: 1068739
Charity reporting is up to date (99 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £383.30k £364.45k £418.94k £500.57k £514.41k
Total expenditure £366.52k £339.40k £384.33k £569.79k £584.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £500.57k £514.41k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £569.79k £584.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £6.40k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0