LIFE EDUCATION CENTRES BROMLEY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our educators visit primary schools. Each class is visited with their teacher present. The Life Space, if used, is equipped with Audio/Visual materials and interactive resources. Our Educators present a different programme of Health, Well being and Drug Prevention to each age group. The teaching fulfils the government strategy for Drug and Health Education as defined in PSHE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Kent
- Lewisham
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 November 1997: Standard registration
- LIFE EDUCATION CENTRES BROMLEY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSAMUND JANET SKINNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Bromfield | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Edna McGarry | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Whitehouse | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
TONY JACK CATHERALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT STEWART MCGLASHAM BAIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.19k | £55.22k | £67.81k | £68.48k | £63.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.05k | £50.33k | £56.57k | £58.86k | £76.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE PARTICULARLY IN RESPECT OF THE DANGERS OF DRUGS AND ADDICTIVE MATERIALS AND SUBSTANCES PRIMARILY BY VIDEOS AND OTHER FORMS OF AUDIO VISUAL MATERIAL AND PUBLICATIONS AND BY USING ANY OTHER MEANS OF DISSEMINATION AND COMMUNICATION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL AND INFORMATION; (2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; (3) TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION FOR THE PUBLIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED OR SUFFERING FROM ILLNESS, DISEASES OR SICKNESS WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO CONDITIONS CONSEQUENT UPON DRUG AND ALCOHOL ABUSE AND SIMILAR SOCIAL PROBLEMS IN ALL CASES IN THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 DARRICK WOOD ROAD
ORPINGTON
BR6 8AW
- Phone:
- 01689 826837
- Email:
- baird1@virginmedia.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window