FRIENDS OF MICHELHAM PRIORY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise income to support, promote and improve Michelham Priory including its amenities grounds and buildings through the activities of a group of Friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 07 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alana Johnston | Chair | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Creasey | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Brooke-Taylor | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Scott | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Dennis | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bonner | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gill Jones | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Scrivener | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Phillips | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Cuttell | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Baker | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01k | £3.34k | £91.33k | £2.38k | £3.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.08k | £11.05k | £916 | £24.32k | £5.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/06/1998 AS AMENDED ON 27/06/1998 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 04/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF MICHELHAM PRIORY BY THE PROVISION OF PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PRIORY, ITS AMENITIES, GROUNDS AND BUILDINGS THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE GROUP OF FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PEELINGS COTTAGES
MILTON STREET
HANKHAM
PEVENSEY
BN24 5AU
- Phone:
- 01323460235
- Email:
- soleharmer@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window