HINDU COUNCIL (UK)

Charity Number: 1067682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Form a united consensus on policies and issues effecting the UK Hindus Undertake research, development and educational projects Make representations on behalf of Hindus Provide support for Hindu organisations Carry out Interfaith related work

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £47
Total expenditure: £1,137

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mailvaganam Perinpanathan Trustee 22 September 2024
BRITTANIA HINDU (SHIVA) TEMPLE TRUST
Received: 21 days late
ANIL BHANOT Trustee 04 September 2022
PEEPUL CENTRE
Received: On time
Krishna Bhan Trustee 08 July 2016
None on record
Coossialsing Goapul Trustee 08 July 2016
None on record
DIPEN RAJYAGURU Trustee 08 July 2016
None on record
APPATHURAI VAIRAVAMOORTHY Trustee 18 December 2011
BRITTANIA HINDU (SHIVA) TEMPLE TRUST
Received: 21 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £163 £1.34k £11.75k £5.00k £47
Total expenditure £1.86k £1.27k £2.25k £8.20k £1.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Boardman House
64 Broadway
London
E15 1NT
Phone:
02088101664