THE CAXTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To address the problem of underachievement that has its roots in literacy and numeracy difficulties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 November 1998: Standard registration
- CATCH UP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Gerard Hubert Lane | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|||||
William Alan Warner | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Atholl Stuart-Grumbar | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA EMMETT | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|||||
INGRID LUNT | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|||||
SIONED BOWEN | Trustee | 08 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £518.69k | £525.56k | £754.49k | £559.30k | £254.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £599.94k | £423.36k | £584.61k | £500.82k | £349.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £74.16k | N/A | £4.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £48.80k | £46.50k | £33.00k | £34.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £324.42k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £469.74k | £80.43k | £531.59k | £381.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £145 | £59 | £19 | £1.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £74.16k | £189.88k | £142.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £599.94k | £423.34k | £584.61k | £500.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.03k | £11.41k | £7.03k | £6.01k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £21 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 4TH DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 OCTOBER 1998 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Keystone Enterprise Factory
39 Brunel Way
Thetford
IP24 1HP
- Phone:
- 01842 668080
- Email:
- info@catchup.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window