Financial history THE ANGEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1067819
Charity reporting is up to date (150 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.00k £70.00k £30.00k £49.84k £37.84k
Total expenditure £17.00k £38.09k £41.55k £51.20k £46.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A