Financial history THE UNIVERSITY OF HULL MARITIME HISTORY TRUST

Charity Number: 1074798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £933 £11.16k £10.51k £11.33k £11.51k
Total expenditure £6.14k £634 £1.75k £646 £19.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A