HUNTINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall serving the needs of the community with room hire, cafe, pensioners socials, classes, charity fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 April 2024
Total income includes £4,710 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 February 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Chivers | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Angela Rawlings | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Di Geogheghan-Breen | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Erica Town | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|||||
JEAN WILLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN CHIVERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ORRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Karen Elizabeth Hyman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/04/2020 | 27/04/2021 | 27/04/2022 | 27/04/2023 | 27/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.92k | £34.20k | £15.27k | £14.22k | £23.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.82k | £17.47k | £25.36k | £19.47k | £27.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £27.43k | £4.00k | N/A | £4.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 April 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 April 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 April 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 April 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 April 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 14 OCTOBER 1988
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HUNTINGTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HUNTINGTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Huntington Community Centre
26 Strensall Road
Huntington
YORK
YO32 9RG
- Phone:
- 01904 760246
- Website:
-
huntingtoncentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window