Accounts and annual returns RYEDALE SPECIAL FAMILIES

Charity number: 1069586
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 22 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 22 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 27 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 January 2015 On Time