Financial history RYEDALE SPECIAL FAMILIES

Charity number: 1069586
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £292.12k £375.83k £270.13k £323.88k £398.18k
Total expenditure £284.56k £335.53k £301.60k £326.76k £394.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £151.15k £198.70k £227.32k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.50k £0 £7.00k