Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE LYMINGTON NEW FOREST HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1070233
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £92.28k £51.95k £260.44k £189.84k £108.78k
Total expenditure £613.26k £75.92k £66.28k £63.22k £284.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A