Financial history THE SOLTI FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1068604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.06k £27.17k £14.13k £16.79k £19.67k
Total expenditure £30.53k £38.33k £40.45k £43.30k £82.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A