Financial history 33RD OXFORD (KIDLINGTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1068248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.52k £31.54k £22.91k £15.39k £15.91k
Total expenditure £33.19k £15.66k £14.30k £17.03k £18.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A