Accounts and annual returns PEN-Y-RHONDDA TRUST

Charity Number: 1069559
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required