Financial history PEN-Y-RHONDDA TRUST

Charity number: 1069559
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.23k £1.73k £1.32k £1.47k £995
Total expenditure £3.36k £3.37k £3.96k £3.28k £4.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A