Financial history THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR ALLERGY & CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY

Charity number: 1069199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £703.56k £655.20k £438.51k £1.23m £396.53k
Total expenditure £631.04k £661.06k £480.73k £1.10m £551.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £15.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.00k £30 N/A £3.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £637.15k £601.33k N/A £1.15m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £27.95k £25.71k N/A £27.55k N/A
Income - Other £33.46k £28.14k N/A £49.26k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £624.42k £654.20k N/A £1.09m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.62k £6.86k N/A £7.97k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £250.66k £59.38k N/A £84.13k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £6.62k £6.86k N/A £7.97k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A