Financial history EIL UK

Charity Number: 1070440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £573.49k £249.78k £281.18k £380.94k £532.25k
Total expenditure £556.91k £325.53k £361.14k £479.58k £602.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £43.73k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £574 N/A N/A N/A £30.20k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £545.12k N/A N/A N/A £474.23k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £27.42k N/A N/A N/A £27.73k
Income - Other £372 N/A N/A N/A £90
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £19.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £556.91k N/A N/A N/A £602.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £50
Expenditure - Governance £3.54k N/A N/A N/A £1.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0