Financial history NEATH PORT TALBOT CANCER CHALLENGE

Charity Number: 1070021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £21.68k £8.70k £40.46k £83.64k £45.12k
Total expenditure £3.11k £488 £63.27k £89.41k £31.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A