MARLBOROUGH & DISTRICT LINK SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the organisation are to relieve poor, sick, elderly or disabled persons in Marlborough and the surrounding villages by providing or assisting in the provision of services calculated to reduce the need, hardship or distress of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Williams | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark McFarland | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Campion | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Blair | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Henry Pearson | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN GEORGE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.10k | £23.74k | £21.22k | £27.54k | £32.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.28k | £23.61k | £20.59k | £25.77k | £29.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £869 | £617 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED 29 MAY 2002 AND 29 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POOR, SICK, ELDERLY OR DISABLED PERSONS IN MARLBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
MARLBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Kelham Gardens
MARLBOROUGH
Wiltshire
SN8 1PW
- Phone:
- 01672 516830
- Email:
- hugh@desaram.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window