Accounts and annual returns SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1069304
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 June 2024 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 February 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 February 2022 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required