Financial history CHRISTIAN SURFERS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1070830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £62.54k £41.27k £58.03k £72.55k £72.24k
Total expenditure £51.95k £34.62k £41.12k £61.44k £61.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A