CHRISTIAN SURFERS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Surfers UK aims to be a Christian presence and witness in the surfing community. We organise numerous events around the country, ranging from high profile surf competitions to conferences and surf days. In addition we help resource the Christian surf community, and serve the National and local surfing community, by volunteering. We are part of the International Christian Surfers network.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 July 1998: Standard registration
- CHRISTIAN SURFERS UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CHARLES CROUCH | Chair | 09 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Lillie | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Quinn | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ellse | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Jade Elizabeth Holter | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALICE ELIZABETH LOUISE OVENDEN | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SWIFT | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Philip Williams | Trustee | 28 March 1998 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.54k | £41.27k | £58.03k | £72.55k | £72.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.95k | £34.62k | £41.12k | £61.44k | £61.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/01/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 WALNUT CLOSE
NAILSEA
BRISTOL
BS48 4YH
- Phone:
- 01275857834
- Email:
- phil@christiansurfers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window