THE COWDRAY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration and opening to the public of a Tudor mansion house in Midhurst West Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Malcom Kennedy | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN EDWARD RUSSELL | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE NEWBIGGING | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|||||
VISCOUNT MICHAEL ORLANDO WEETMAN COWDRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.17k | £80.90k | £66.49k | £112.34k | £70.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.31k | £58.63k | £85.11k | £145.91k | £96.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £22.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.60k | £19.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE, MAINTAIN, REPAIR, IMPROVE, AND MANAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE RUINS OF THE TUDOR MANSION KNOWN AS COWDRAY RUINS, MIDHURST, WEST SUSSEX TOGETHER WITH THE ADJOINING AMENITY LAND ("THE COWDRAY RUINS") AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY, AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF THE SAME AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST; (2) TO PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE AMENITIES OF THE COWDRAY RUINS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (3) TO PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CONJUNCTION WITH ANY BUILDINGS VESTED IN THE CHARITY ANY CHATTELS WHICH ARE ORDINARILY KEPT IN ANY SUCH BUILDINGS OR WHICH MAY BE GIVEN OR LOANED TO THE CHARITY AND WHICH THE CHARITY CONSIDERS TO BE APPROPRIATE TO BE KEPT THEREAT, AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF THE SAME AS ITEMS OF HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST; (4)TO FACILITATE AND ENCOURAGE THE USE AND OCCUPATION OF AND ACCESS TO AND STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF THE COWDRAY RUINS AND ANY SUCH CHATTELS BY THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
MIDHURST, WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cowdray Estate Office
Cowdray Park
Easebourne
MIDHURST
GU29 0AQ
- Phone:
- 01730812423
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window