Trustees GREAT HINTON MEMORIAL HALL TRUST
Charity Number: 1069606

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Martin Saunders | Chair | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Lawes | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Mark John La Turner | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Barrington-Fox | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ricky Humphreys | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carol A Clarke | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Mary Kwasnicki | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Minty | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS S ANDREW | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.