Financial history CRANLEIGH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1070856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £28.10m £34.33m £32.19m £35.18m £36.93m
Total expenditure £27.20m £27.03m £30.16m £32.04m £35.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £411.00k £391.00k £321.00k £380.00k £433.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.81m £7.15m £1.37m £2.39m £1.14m
Income - Charitable activities £24.78m £26.04m £29.51m £32.15m £34.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £88.00k £68.00k £85.00k £236.00k £421.00k
Income - Other £1.01m £690.00k £902.00k £25.00k £26.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £124.00k £14.00k £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.81m £25.87m £28.95m £30.80m £33.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.39m £1.16m £1.21m £1.24m £1.61m
Expenditure - Governance £294.00k £159.00k £171.00k £229.00k £133.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £25.00k £29.00k £28.00k £24.00k £26.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0