Financial history MID-BUCKS (AYLESBURY) U3A

Charity number: 1070207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.03k £2.58k £1.65k £7.35k £7.15k
Total expenditure £7.70k £1.22k £3.50k £7.00k £7.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A