Trustees MID-BUCKS (AYLESBURY) U3A

Charity number: 1070207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Robert James White Chair 16 May 2024
CHESS VALLEY MALE VOICE CHOIR
Received: On time
Sandra Chaudhry Trustee 26 July 2022
None on record
Wendy Doreen Russell Trustee 07 February 2022
None on record
David John Mummery MBE BEM Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record
Valerie Blackburn Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Chris Blaik Trustee 15 May 2015
None on record
Michael Walden Trustee 15 May 2014
None on record