FIVE WAYS COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust is used to provide extra learning resources in the classroom and educational trips for the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 17 August 1998: Standard registration
- FIVE WAYS PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Burden | Chair | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Darby | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Declan Farrell | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kim Cole | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Rowsell | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Holland | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mander | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN LABON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK BIRCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.37k | £26.68k | £9.20k | £26.24k | £31.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.87k | £19.50k | £10.74k | £50.03k | £34.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 February 2021 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 July 2021 | 370 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE FIVE WAYS COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIVE WAYS PRIMARY SCHOOL
LANGHOLM DRIVE
HEATH HAYES
CANNOCK
STAFFORDSHIRE
WS12 2EZ
- Phone:
- 01543278071
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window