Financial history CROXTETH GEMS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1071179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £219.77k £335.01k £137.08k £135.34k £224.38k
Total expenditure £229.13k £162.38k £194.84k £231.73k £236.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.58k £11.25k £24.58k £52.56k £13.50k