Financial history NORTHUMBERLAND ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1071245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £8.28k £261 £9.34k £9.22k £11.58k
Total expenditure £6.18k £3.75k £10.59k £11.27k £10.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A