Trustees NORTHUMBERLAND ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1071245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wendy Locks Trustee 07 October 2024
MORPETH MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Karen Ann Riddle Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Adam Clark Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
David Tallent Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Nicholas Philip Barker Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
Dr ELEANOR HORN Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record
Caterina Maria Josina Griffiths Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record
Robert Andrew I-Hsien Porter Trustee 19 October 2015
None on record
Amy Gleeson Trustee 07 November 2013
None on record
Geoffrey Carter Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF JESMOND DENE
Received: On time