CHRISTIAN INTERNATIONAL EUROPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHRISTIAN INTERNATIONAL EUROPE, TEACHES, PREACHES AND PROPAGATES THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Colombia
- Denmark
- Germany
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Romania
- Scotland
- Slovenia
- United States
Governance
- 09 August 1999: Standard registration
- 19 February 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 19 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1192589 PROPHETIC VOICE
No other names
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.96k | £376.87k | £288.37k | £140.81k | £206.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.14k | £398.97k | £264.53k | £142.08k | £96.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIMES AS THE FOUNDER MAY BY NOTICE IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE AND FOR THE TIME BEING AND UNTIL SUCH FURTHER NOTICE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITIES OF THE FOREGOING (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS PARTICULARLY (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) FOR THE PURPOSE OF TRAINING AND EQUIPPING IN CHRISTIAN LEADERSHIP, MISSION AND MINISTRY (D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLDS WHERE THE CHARITY MAY BE OPERATING AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT SUBJECT TO THE APPROVAL OF THE FOUNDER IN EACH INDIVIDUAL CASE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window