Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS' CHURCH, HITCHAM, SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1072625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £107.51k £107.90k £20.35k £65.74k £29.21k
Total expenditure £139.94k £123.76k £15.42k £9.62k £70.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A