ASIAN SERVICES & PROJECTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention and relief of poverty Empowering through education and scholarship programmes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- China
Governance
- 23 March 1999: Standard registration
- 14 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 14 January 2025: Funds transferred to 327709 CHINESE CHURCH SUPPORT MINISTRIES
- AS&P (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.94k | £9.84k | £3.99k | £9.59k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.18k | £8.48k | £1.22k | £881 | £192 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ORPHANS, CHILDREN, ADULTS AND THE ELDERLY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN ASIA BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window