Financial history DOVERY MANOR MUSEUM

Charity Number: 1079760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £9.17k £1.53k £1.12k £4.06k £9.04k
Total expenditure £3.28k £6.42k £2.97k £7.73k £7.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A