Financial history THE KAOS ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1080310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.59k £8.20k £1.63k £10.56k £14.29k
Total expenditure £25.55k £6.41k £2.73k £11.21k £11.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A