Financial history HENRY ALLEN NURSERY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1072608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.93k £13.59k £12.52k £11.22k £15.97k
Total expenditure £7.31k £33.56k £12.94k £10.77k £10.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A