Trustees HENRY ALLEN NURSERY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1072608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrea Bishop Trustee 15 May 2024
HENRY ALLEN NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Alice Memminger Trustee 06 February 2024
None on record
Christopher Chilton Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Deirdre Snudden Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Julie Manning Trustee 01 January 2021
HENRY ALLEN NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CHARLOTTE MACDONALD Trustee 29 January 2013
None on record