THE BOM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are: to provide education, training and research into all aspects of the promotion and protection of human and family life in accordance with the teachings of the Roman Catholic Church, particularly in relation to fertility regulation for the natural achievement or avoidance of pregnancy and monitoring reproductive health by means of Billings Ovulation Method TM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 September 1999: Standard registration
- 12 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- BILLINGS FAMILY LIFE CENTRE (Working name)
- BILLINGS NATURAL FAMILY PLANNING CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.07k | £6.87k | £7.59k | £6.20k | £4.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.51k | £9.70k | £5.87k | £5.04k | £4.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF HUMAN AND FAMILY LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window