Financial history THE BARBARA NASH TRUST FOR THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING

Charity number: 1079894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/03/2020 18/03/2021 18/03/2022 18/03/2023 18/03/2024
Total gross income £4.74k £6.28k £5.37k £5.29k £6.50k
Total expenditure £11.69k £1.15k £148.97k £123.95k £125.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A