Financial history Croydon Mencap

Charity number: 1073063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £493.14k £549.40k £675.47k £581.82k £740.83k
Total expenditure £567.78k £562.68k £706.17k £676.45k £781.82k
Income from government contracts £368.64k £428.78k £387.46k £436.52k £461.36k
Income from government grants £57.55k £57.55k £25.90k £49.27k £51.67k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £15.43k £167.69k £60.77k £31.74k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £7.46k £6.60k £8.38k £8.15k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £506.13k £493.91k £505.42k £682.22k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £5.98k £5.39k £7.26k £17.33k
Income - Other N/A £14.40k £1.87k £0 £1.39k
Income - Legacies N/A £2.00k £10.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £562.68k £706.17k £676.45k £781.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £13.64k £5.72k £2.40k £2.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0