Governing document Croydon Mencap

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2015 as amended on 19 Apr 2021 as amended on 30 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 The objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit: 3.1.1 to provide or assist in the provision of services, support and information, in particular to children and adults with a learning disability and/or autism but also to disabled children and adults, children and adults with special needs and their families, dependents and carers in the London Borough of Croydon and its environs, to enable them to experience fulfilling lives and maximise their involvement in the community and participation as citizens; and 3.1.2 to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for the recreation or other leisure time occupation for children and adults who have need thereof by reason of learning disability and/or autism or other disability or special needs with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.