Financial history EMMAUS PRESTON

Charity number: 1073677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £653.17k £630.04k £678.63k £1.15m £865.09k
Total expenditure £624.59k £616.39k £711.74k £1.32m £1.08m
Income from government contracts £67.70k £79.74k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £71.97k N/A £7.16k £1.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £73.12k £29.00k £23.34k £45.10k £32.70k
Income - Other trading activities £401.62k £365.86k £508.71k £839.68k £555.37k
Income - Charitable activities £172.14k £139.67k £138.19k £252.41k £262.49k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.30k £4.95k £8.39k £9.54k £14.52k
Income - Other £0 £90.55k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £371.14k £364.19k £397.34k £748.86k £670.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds £250.45k £252.21k £311.03k £566.75k £403.77k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.48k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £25.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.00k £0 £3.37k £8.73k £5.00k