Financial history THE SHERBORNE SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1073522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.10m £692.19k £1.02m £666.74k £535.74k
Total expenditure £430.68k £2.24m £890.04k £1.29m £429.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.22k £11.94k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.09m £691.81k £1.02m £609.63k £523.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £38.41k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £388 £1.25k £18.70k £11.98k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £321.07k £196.27k £35.67k £160.00k £81.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £310.40k £2.17m £766.04k £1.20m £341.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds £120.28k £75.38k £124.00k £81.59k £88.05k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.22k £11.66k £4.26k £7.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £854 £474 £298 £110
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0