Financial history WILLOW PARK HOUSING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1074481
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £37.04m £38.20m £40.44m £40.99m £40.72m
Total expenditure £32.82m £37.09m £37.88m £54.87m £38.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £17.00k £17.00k £0 N/A
Income from government grants £3.89m £512.22k £3.28m £159.00k £172.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £36.36m £37.97m £39.71m £39.60m £39.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £61.00k £67.00k £65.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Income - Other £621.00k £168.00k £665.00k £1.39m £1.70m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £32.82m £37.09m £37.88m £54.87m £38.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0