Governing document WILLOW PARK HOUSING TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 25 FEB 1999, 26 FEB 1999, 16 MAR 1999, 21 OCT 1999, 17 NOV 1999, 19 OCT 2002, 2 NOV 2000, 7 DEC 2004 AND 14 MAY 2009. NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS FORMED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. ITS CHARITABLE OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY: A2.1 THE BUSINESS OF: ? PROVIDING AND MANAGING HOUSING (INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING); ? PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE; AND ? PROVIDING ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, AMENITIES AND SERVICES, IN EACH CASE FOR POOR PEOPLE OR FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; A2.2 ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT FROM TIME TO TIME BY A REGISTERED SOCIETY REGISTERED AS A PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE REGULATOR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.